U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Hinton v. Life Insurance Company of North America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2022
  • December 24, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • December 08, 2022: [Modify]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 07, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 03, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 03, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.