U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00401
  • Case Name: Altman v. J. Alexander's Restaurants, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 01, 2022: [Stay]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2022: [Stay]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • August 04, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.