U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. Niles et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reopen Case]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: [Leave to]
  • January 01, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Rule 7.1(a)(2)Disclosure Statement - Diversity]
  • January 16, 2023: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Deficiency]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Proposed Agreed Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Entry of Default]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 04, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.