U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Bledsoe v. Thompson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 05, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 09, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 09, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 04, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.