U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Cravens v. Thompson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 31, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 04, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 04, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 04, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.