U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00397
  • Case Name: Francis v. NASA Headquarters
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 09, 2022: [Attachments]
  • August 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 05, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.