U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Blackburn v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent]
  • November 18, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 31, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 29, 2022: [Set Answer Date]
  • August 26, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • August 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 09, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 07, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.