U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00405
  • Case Name: Campbell v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Fact/Law Summary]
  • December 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Fact/Law Summary]
  • November 08, 2022: [Brief]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Social Security Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Social Security Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [SSA Administrative Record]
  • October 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Social Security Case Assignment]
  • August 08, 2022: [SSA Notice of Service]
  • August 08, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.