U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00404
  • Case Name: O'Bannon v. Louisville Metro Government et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • December 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 09, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.