U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Green v. Perkins et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • October 03, 2024: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • October 01, 2024: [Leave to]
  • October 01, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 13, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 09, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.