U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Moffitt v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 09, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.