U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Meyer v. Ford Motor Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 25, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • August 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 16, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 10, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.