U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00102
  • Case Name: DeLeon v. Grayson County Kentucky et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 05, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 19, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 10, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 10, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 10, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.