U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00101
  • Case Name: McNeal v. Slade et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Remark (Public)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 14, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 04, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 06, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 10, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 10, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.