U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00407
  • Case Name: Nix v. Mazza
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 21, 2022: [Substitute Party]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • September 08, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 10, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 10, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.