U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Blackhorn USA, LLC et al v. Tooth Acres, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Proposed Agreed Order]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 27, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 10, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.