U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Whitlock et al v. Dixie Trucking Company, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 28, 2022: [Reference Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 10, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.