U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00409
  • Case Name: Courtney et al v. Inverness Technologies, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.