U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00410
  • Case Name: Guevara Rodriguez v. Checkr, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.