U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Henning v. Fentress et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 21, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 22, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 12, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 11, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.