U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Barnes v. Daviess County Government et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Reply]
  • January 13, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 09, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 09, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 24, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.