U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00411
  • Case Name: Green v. Ally Financial Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.