U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Griffin Residuals, LLC v. Gryphon Environmental, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Remand]
  • September 09, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 08, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • September 01, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.