U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00408
  • Case Name: Heath v. Administrative Office of the Courts
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response]
  • November 02, 2022: [Default Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Response]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.