U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Report]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Referring Motion - TEXT ONLY]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 12, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.