U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Western Surety Company v. Niles et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Rule 7.1(a)(2)Disclosure Statement - Diversity]
  • January 13, 2023: [Deficiency]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Proposed Agreed Order]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Docket Correction]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 12, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.