U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00413
  • Case Name: Jones v. The United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Status Report]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • December 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 12, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.