U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00412
  • Case Name: Dunlap v. Louisville Metro Detention Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Leave to]
  • March 20, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Proposed Agreed Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • October 10, 2024: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 04, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 05, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 17, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 12, 2022: [Leave to]
  • September 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 12, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.