U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Hines Furlong Line, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Request for Fee Refund]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice Renewal Payment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice Renewal Payment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Invoice Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee - For PHV Clerk Only]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2024: [Compel]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 17, 2023: [Answer to Counterclaim]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 14, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.