U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Zurich American Insurance Company et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 15, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 15, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.