U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Brown v. Penick et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 03, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Response]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 15, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.