U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00415
  • Case Name: Twagiramungu et al v. Wiley Sanders Truck Lines, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 20, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.