U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00420
  • Case Name: Muhammad v. University of Louisville Peace Hospital
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Status Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.