U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00418
  • Case Name: Douglas v. UofL Health - Louisville, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 13, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Schedules]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.