U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Fleet v. Southern Orthopedic Associates, P.S.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 26, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 23, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.