U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00414
  • Case Name: Kammer v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 16, 2022: [Brief]
  • December 16, 2022: [Fact/Law Summary]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Social Security Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [SSA Administrative Record]
  • October 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Social Security Case Assignment]
  • August 16, 2022: [SSA Notice of Service]
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.