U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00419
  • Case Name: Gallagher v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 01, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.