U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00421
  • Case Name: Simpson v. Plant Partners, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2022: [Remand]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 16, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.