U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00424
  • Case Name: Harris v. Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.