U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Solomon v. Bel Brands USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 18, 2022: [Remand]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 18, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.