U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00425
  • Case Name: Bartley v. Trans Union, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 17, 2022: [Schedules]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.