U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00422
  • Case Name: Seminole Indians of Kentucky et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Certify Class]
  • August 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 18, 2022: [Certify Class]
  • August 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 18, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 18, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.