U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Baker v. Chandler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 19, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • December 15, 2022: [Remark (Public)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 04, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.