U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00427
  • Case Name: Greenwell v. Harris et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.