U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00430
  • Case Name: Nevitt v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 26, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 25, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.