U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00432
  • Case Name: Bricklayers Local 4 IN/KY v. Rosa Mosaic and Tile Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Stay]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2022: [Brief]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 22, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.