U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00433
  • Case Name: Heuke v. Advanced Bionics Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 06, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 23, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 22, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.