U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Claim]
  • January 12, 2023: [Memorandum]
  • January 12, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 23, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.