U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00437
  • Case Name: Stamey v. Trans Union, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 24, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 24, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.