U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00438
  • Case Name: Kjeldahl v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 24, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 24, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.